judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CARTER, FREDERICK UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-0940
Short Caption:CARTER, FREDERICK UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1811-79Filed Date:08/06/1980

Opening Event Date:08/06/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/23/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/22/1983
Argued/Submitted:09/29/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CARTER, FREDERICK UNITED STATES
08/06/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/23/1983FiledRecord Completed
06/22/1983FiledBriefing Completed
09/29/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/30/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition