judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COACH USA VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34637
Short Caption:COACH USA VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A394386Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Delanoy Schuetze & McGaha, P.C.--check no. 4358.
08/09/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Request for Stay of Proceedings Below during the Pendency of this Writ. 99-07300
08/10/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Proof of service on the respondent district judge. Due Date: 10 days. 99-07334
08/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-07637
08/31/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 99-08151
01/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. fn1[Although this court could construe the failure to file an answer as a confession of error, we decline to do so. For the failure to file an answer as this court ordered, we sanction attorney Joseph A. Scalia $250.00, payable to the Supreme Court Law Library. Attorney Scalia shall file proof of payment with the clerk of this court not later than 30 days from the date of this order]. " . . . we deny the petition." fn2[We deny petitioners' request for a stay in light of this order]. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB (Order mailed to attorney Scalia by regular and certified mail). 00-00479
02/08/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-01958
02/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/14/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Proof of Payment. 00-02336