judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEO PAUL LAWRENCE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0065)
Case Number:S-07-0065Case Docketed On:03/21/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:LEO PAUL LAWRENCE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LEO PAUL LAWRENCE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLeo Paul LawrenceDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Michael M. Robinson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 183
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/21/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/21/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/08/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
06/20/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
06/25/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/10/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/17/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, ten volumes. Volumes I - V, Original Pleadings and Hearing Transcripts; Volume VI - IX, Trial Transcripts; Volume X, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
11/15/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/03/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/03/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/06/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal