judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAYMOND E. ROBISON, III v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0050)
Case Number:S-10-0050Case Docketed On:03/02/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Motor Vehicles 31-1-101 through 31-18-903
Short Title:RAYMOND E. ROBISON, III v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RAYMOND E. ROBISON, III, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRaymond E. Robison IIIDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -DUI, Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2011 WY 4
Citation:243 P.3d 259

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/02/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/16/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/20/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/03/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/03/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/19/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/05/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/13/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Paul S. Rehurek for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/21/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Paul S. Rehurek, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/19/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/04/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/04/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/08/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/7/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal