judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: KEH SOO PARK

Case Information: 11-BG-0375
Short Caption:IN RE: KEH SOO PARKClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN99-11Filed Date:03/23/2011

Opening Event Date:03/23/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentKeh Soo Park NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/23/2011DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with an attested copy of an order of the Virginia State Bar Disciplinary Board acception Mr. Park's consent to revocatiion in the Commonwealth of Virginia.
04/14/2011ORDER Having received an attested copy of an order of the Virginia State Disciplinary Board revoking respondent's license to practice law, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be disbarred from the practice of law in the District of Columbia. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the court with the relevant portions of the record of the proceeding in the other discipliining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirements of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
05/26/2011STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline.
06/02/2011TMC - notice of reciprocal discipline - OTSC - statement of bar counsel - proposed order
06/23/2011FiledDISBARMENT ORDERED that Keh Soo Park, Esquire, is hereby disbarred from the practiceof law in the District of Columbia. It is FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of reinstatement respondent's suspension will not begin to run until such time as she files an affidavit that fully complies with the requirement of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (BR, NE, KG)
07/07/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of nonfiling by respondent the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.