judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTONIO COLBERT V. NEW YORK AVENUE PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH

Case Information: 11-CV-0374
Short Caption:ANTONIO COLBERT V. NEW YORK AVENUE PRESBYTERIAN CHURCHClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB204-11Filed Date:03/16/2011

Opening Event Date:03/16/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/01/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAntonio ColbertYPro SeN
AppelleeNew York Avenue Presbyterian ChurchN
Deborah E. Kane NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/16/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/31/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismised for having been IMPROPERLY FILED since an appealable order has not be identified...OR since the NOA IS NOT SIGNED... (BY: ETW)
05/11/2011 ORDERED that this appeal is HEREBY DISMISSED...See DC App. R. 3 (c)(2)... (BY: ETW) LW
05/11/2011WithdrawnDISMISSED
06/02/2011WithdrawnMANDATE ISSUED
06/29/2011RECEIVED - aplt's ltr requesting to speak with the Chief Judge.
08/31/2011FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Granted
09/22/2011FiledMandate Recalled
09/22/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Recall Mandate and Reinstating Appeal
09/22/2011FiledNo Transcript Needed
10/03/2011FiledRecord Copies
10/03/2011FiledRecord Index
10/03/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/18/2011FiledBriefing Order
12/01/2011FiledOrder Directing Appellant to submit the brief and the limited appendix accompanied by a motion for leave within 20 days from the date of the order
01/09/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
01/09/2012FiledDismissed
02/01/2012FiledMandate