judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MARY JANE MEADE v. BURTON G. HACKNEY, ET AL.

Case: B-2761
B-2761
06/02/1971
Application for Writ of Error
MARY JANE MEADE
BURTON G. HACKNEY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/06/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/28/1971Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
06/16/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/02/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/10/1971Response to Motion filed
08/06/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/28/1971Supplemental Brief filed
06/16/1971Response to Petition
06/02/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/02/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mary Jane MeadePetitioner
Burton G. Hackney, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information