Case Information: 79476 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: DISABILITY INACTIVE MARK E. PEPLOWSKI | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Bar Matter - Disability - Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/26/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. Bar Matter.(SC) | ||
08/26/2019 | Petition/Bar | Filed Joint Petition and Stipulation for Transfer to Disability Inactive Status. (SC) | ||
10/09/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Transfer to Disability Inactive Status and Referral to Disciplinary Board. Peplowski is transferred to disability inactive status pending disciplinary proceeding against him is suspended pending further order of this court. We refer this matter to the Southern Nevada Disciplinary Board for hearing and recommendation by a hearing panel as provided in SCR 117(2). Bar counsel shall provide this court with a written report within 60 days. Peplowski shall comply with SCR 115, but if he is unable to do so, the State Bar shall proceed under SCR 118. The State Bar shall comply with SCR 121.1 and provide this court with proof that notice has been served. Fn1[The Honorable Michael Douglas, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment. MG/LS/MD (SC) | ||
10/16/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Service to the Courts Re: Order of Transfer to Disability Inactive Status and Referral to Disciplinary Board. (SC) | ||
12/12/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Status Report. (SC) | ||
10/06/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Competency Hearing, Pleadings and Transcript of Hearing Volume 1. | ||
10/06/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Competency Hearing, Pleadings and Transcript of Hearing Volume 2. | ||
11/13/2020 | Order/Dispositional Bar | Filed Order Regarding Disability Inactive Status. "Attorney Mark Peplowski shall remain on disability inactive status and the pending disciplinary proceeding against him is suspended." fn1 [This order shall be public but all other documents filed with this court in this matter shall remain confidential. SCR 117(2). This order constitutes our final disposition of this petition.] NNP20-RP/JH/EC. (SC). | 20-41486 | |
11/25/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice to the Courts No. 79476. (REJECTED PER 11/25/20 NOTICE). (SC) | 20-43117 | |
11/25/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. "Notice to the Courts No. 79476". (SC) | 20-43172 | |
12/08/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC). | ||
12/08/2020 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). |