judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WARD (DALE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34958
Short Caption:WARD (DALE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38455
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991291Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09882
10/19/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Robert Bruce Lindsay shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-10136
11/12/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on appointing as counsel for appellant. 99-11194
11/24/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Notice that No Transcripts are Necessary. 99-11789
01/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-01441
01/31/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Allow Filing of Fast Track Statement. 00-01568
02/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement provisionally submitted on January 21, 2000. fn1[We deny as moot counsel's January 31, 2000, motion to allow filing of the fast track statement.] 00-02040
02/09/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Fast track statement not signed by attorney Lindsay. 00-01008
02/18/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-02617
03/21/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-04475
04/18/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-06146
04/18/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 20, 2000. 00-06146