judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARTIN DANE IPSEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0052)
Case Number:S-10-0052Case Docketed On:03/04/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MARTIN DANE IPSEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARTIN DANE IPSEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMartin Dane IpsenDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/04/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/21/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/22/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/26/2010Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
04/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; and waiver of appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/27/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
04/27/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal