Case Information: 13-CO-1023 | |||
Short Caption: | ULUS JORDEN V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DVM924-11 | Filed Date: | 09/09/2013 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/09/2013 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 01/10/2014 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Ulus Jorden | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
09/09/2013 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
09/20/2013 | Filed | Initial Order | ||
11/13/2013 | Filed | Ordered that this appeal is hereby dismissed | ||
11/13/2013 | Withdrawn | Dismissed | ||
11/27/2013 | Filed | Motion To Reinstate Appeal (Appellant) | Granted | |
01/08/2014 | Filed | Order Granting Motion To Reinstate Appeal and this appeal is hereby reinstated | ||
01/10/2014 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
01/10/2014 | Filed | Record Index | ||
01/10/2014 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
01/30/2014 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
04/14/2014 | Filed | Ordered that appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief and appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time | ||
06/03/2014 | Filed | Ordered that this appeal is hereby dismissed | ||
06/03/2014 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
06/23/2014 | Filed | Motion To Reinstate Appeal (Appellant) | Denied | |
08/14/2014 | Filed | Ordered that counsel for appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief and appendix | ||
09/02/2014 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) | Granted | |
10/17/2014 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix within 30 days from the date of this order and appellant's motion to reinstate appeal remains held in abeyance | ||
01/05/2015 | Filed | Order Denying appellant's motion to reinstate |