judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JIM LYKINS and JILL M. SELLARS v. HABITAT FOR HUMANITY, THE HEART OF WYOMING, INC.

Case Heading (S-10-0045)
Case Number:S-10-0045Case Docketed On:02/24/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:JIM LYKINS and JILL M. SELLARS v. HABITAT FOR HUMANITY, THE HEART OF WYOMING, INC.
Full Title:JIM LYKINS and JILL M. SELLARS, Appellants (Defendants), v. HABITAT FOR HUMANITY, THE HEART OF WYOMING, INC., Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJim Lykins Pro Se
AppellantJill Sellars Pro Se
AppelleeHabitat For Humanity, The Heart of Wyoming, Inc.Jerry A. Yaap

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure
Opinion Number:2010 WY 118
Citation:237 P.3d 405

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/24/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
02/24/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/26/2010Event - Phone Call from Appellant Sellars re docketing letter. Also advised Court of her new address, change made.EventPhone CallFinal
03/11/2010Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
03/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to dismiss appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/17/2010Event - Phone Call. Received call from Jill Sellars indicating that her middle initial is "M" - changed caption accordingly.EventPhone CallFinal
03/30/2010Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss AppealOrderDenyFinal
04/13/2010Brief - AppellantsBriefAppellantFinal
05/06/2010Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
05/07/2010Motion - Withdraw a DocumentMotionWithdraw a documentFinal
05/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Motion for Order to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2010Order - Other - Withdrawing Appellee's Motion to DismissOrderOtherFinal
05/11/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Habitat for Humanity, The Heart of WyomingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/14/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/02/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/14/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/29/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
08/18/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court, Justice Voigt filed a special concurrenceOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/03/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/03/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/08/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/7/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal