judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

SANDRA DOYLE v. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case: B-2767
B-2767
06/04/1971
Application for Writ of Error
SANDRA DOYLE
UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/11/1972Response to Brief filedRespondent
04/07/1972Post submission brief filedPetitioner
04/03/1972Supplement to ResponsePetitioner
03/27/1972Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/27/1972Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/15/1972Supplement to ResponseRespondent
02/24/1972Supplement to ResponseRespondent
02/23/1972Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/03/1971Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
06/11/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/04/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/24/1972Opinion issued
04/11/1972Response to Brief filed
04/07/1972Post submission brief filed
04/03/1972Supplement to Response
03/27/1972Reply to Response
03/27/1972Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/15/1972Supplement to Response
03/01/1972Document received (See Remarks)
03/01/1972Document received (See Remarks)
02/24/1972Supplement to Response
02/23/1972Supplement to Motion filed
02/23/1972Motion for RehearingFiling granted
11/03/1971Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
11/01/1971Motion for leave to file brief
06/11/1971Response to Petition
06/04/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/04/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wade C. SmithAmicus Curiae
Sandra DoylePetitioner
David M. Kendall, Jr.Amicus Curiae
United Services Automobile Association Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information