judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FUDGE (ROY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34951
Short Caption:FUDGE (ROY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C90606Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/14/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09860
11/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record on appeal due: 120 days. fn2[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court]. 99-10879
11/29/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: November 22, 1999. 99-11873
02/14/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on 02/11/00. 00-02320
02/14/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/10/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-11573
08/07/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-11656
08/07/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. 01-11656