judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NASEEF VS. COUNTY OF CLARK

Case Information: 34947
Short Caption:NASEEF VS. COUNTY OF CLARKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A384033Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Senior Justice YoungPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/12/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
10/12/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Las Vegas Gourmet Coffee Company, Inc.--check no. 1082.
10/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09858
10/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 99-10318
11/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant LVGCC shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain counsel and to enter counsel's appearance with the clerk of this court. Failure to comply with this order will result in the immediate dismissal of its appeal. 99-10784
12/08/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant Las Vegas Gourmet Coffee Company: Jeffrey D. McCune. 99-12293
12/09/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Wednesday, May 12, 1999, and Thursday, May 13, 1999. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 99-12380
12/14/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 10, 1999, May 21, 1999, May 27, 1999. Court Reporter: Dina Dalton. 99-12549
12/29/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 20, 1999. Court Reporter: Pauline C. May. 99-13372
01/03/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. May 19, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Felicia Rene Zabin. 00-00004
01/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant LVGCC: 30 days from the date of this order. fn1[Appellant Gary Naseef is proceeding proper person, and thus may not file documents absent permission from this court pursuant to NRAP 46(b)]. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. 00-00501
02/10/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-02111
05/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Dismissing Appeal in Part and Reinstating Briefing. That portion of the appeal from the order denying new trial, the order denying the motion to retax costs and granting expert fees, the amended judgment, and the order granting a temporary writ of restitution is dismissed. fn3[We note that the dismissal of the appeal as to these orders means that Host Marriott is dismissed as a respondent to this appeal. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption on this court's docket to reflect this change.] That portion of the appeal from the order granting costs and attorneys' fees to Clark County may proceed. Appellant LVGCC shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn4[Appellant Gary Naseef is proceeding in proper person, and thus may not file documents absent permission from this court to NRAP 46(b).] 00-07801
05/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: proper person motions. On December 8, 1999, counsel for appellant Las Vegas Gourmet Coffee Company entered an appearance. Before the appearance of counsel, appellant Naseef submitted serveral proper person documents on behalf of himself and LVGCC. fn1[On October 25, 1999, this court received a copy of a motion for leave to appear in forma pauperis that had previously been filed in the district court. The filing fee in this appeal was paid on October 12, 1999, and thus this motion appears to be moot. We conclude that no action on our part is required.] It appears that the transcripts have been filed, and thus no further action is required. fn2[Should LVGCC wish to order transcripts in addition to those already filed with this court, it shall submit a request pursuant to NRAP 9(a) within 15 days of the date of this order.] The motion for extension of time is moot, in that counsel for LVGCC has appeared. It appears that appellant Naseef's interests will be adequately represented by LVGCC, we deny Naseef's motion to appear in proper person. fn3[Although Naseef was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from Naseef.] 00-09113
10/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Las Vegas Gourmet Coffee Company, Inc., shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the immediate dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 00-18456
12/15/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal and Requesting Record. To date, appellant Las Vegas Gourmet Coffee Company, Inc., has failed to comply with our October 18, 2000, order or otherwise communicate with this court. Accordingly, " . . . we hereby dismiss this appeal, as abandoned, as to appellant Las Vegas Gourmet Coffee Company, Inc.' This case will now proceed as a proper person appeal as to appellant Gary M. Naseef only. Having reviewed the documents on file in this proper person appeal, this court has concluded that its review of the complete record is warranted. Within 30 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court the original trial court record pertaining to this appeal. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-21984
01/12/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 through 21. 01-00817
01/12/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/15/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-WM/DA/ML 02-08487
07/18/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP02-WM/DA/ML 02-12289
08/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 21 this day. 02-12793
08/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 13, 2002. 02-12793