judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENNETH GESS v. GERROD L. FLORES, AN INDIVIDUAL, MEIFRONDEE WATERS, AN INDIVIDUAL, AND THE CITY OF CHEYENNE, WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0040)
Case Number:S-10-0040Case Docketed On:02/18/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Certified Question - State District Court
Short Title:KENNETH GESS v. GERROD L. FLORES, AN INDIVIDUAL, MEIFRONDEE WATERS, AN INDIVIDUAL, AND THE CITY OF CHEYENNE, WYOMING
Full Title:KENNETH GESS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. GERROD L. FLORES, AN INDIVIDUAL, MEIFRONDEE WATERS, AN INDIVIDUAL, AND THE CITY OF CHEYENNE, WYOMING, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKenneth GessT. Thomas Metier
Patrick Joseph DiBenedetto
AppelleeGerrod L. FloresCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeMeifronde WatersCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch
AppelleeCity of Cheyenne, Wyoming, a Municipal CorporationCatherine M. Fox
Amanda Ferguson Esch

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Governmental Claims
Opinion Number:2011 WY 48
Citation:249 P.3d 715

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/18/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/18/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/18/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order certifying question Rule 11Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder certifying question Rule 11Final
03/02/2010Order - Certified Question - Accepting questions/briefingOrderCertified Question - Accepting questions/briefingFinal
03/16/2010Notice-Incoming - IndexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/16/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Opening Brief and copy of brief on diskEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/02/2010Brief - Appellee; and statement of costs.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/03/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellees Gerrod L. Flores, Meifrondee Waters, and the City of Cheyenne; and statement of costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/23/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kate Fox for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - T. Thomas Metier for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Patrick Joseph DiBenedetto and T. Thomas Metier, argument by Mr. Metier for appellant; Amanda Kay Ferguson and Catherine M. Fox, argument by Ms. Fox for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/18/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order answering certified questions, Justice Golden writing for the Court, Justice Voigt filed a dissenting opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/05/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal