judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DENISE L. CALLENS V. D.C. DEP'T OF HEALTH

Case Information: 11-AA-0349
Short Caption:DENISE L. CALLENS V. D.C. DEP'T OF HEALTHClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Dept of Health
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOH00225-10Filed Date:03/18/2011

Opening Event Date:03/18/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/04/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDenise L. Callens NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of HealthN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/18/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/18/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/22/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
03/29/2011 ORDERED that DENISE CALLENS SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed FOR LACK OF STANDING SINCE SHE WAS NOT A PARTY BELOW...It is FURTHER ORDERED that DENISE CALLENS SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed FOR LACK OF STANDING since she does not appear to be aggrieved by the Final Order... (BY: ETW)
03/29/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
04/07/2011RECEIVED - Ms. Callens response to show cause (returned: no certificate of service, no signature incorrect number of copies)
04/14/2011RECEIVED - Petitioner's response to show cause order (no certificate of service)
05/11/2011 ORDERED SS that the Clerk shall file the LODGED RESPONSE. It is ****MORE****
05/11/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
05/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the CAPTION IS HEREBY AMENDED AS NOTED ABOVE. It is ****MORE****
05/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the PFR IS DISMISSED w/o prejudice FOR LACK OF STANDING...SEE HARDCOPY (FISTTE)
05/11/2011DISMISSED
08/04/2011FiledMandate