Case: 05-81-00435-CR
05-81-00435-CR
01/31/1981
Burglary of a Building
Bobby Caldwell, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/02/1981 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
06/02/1981 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/20/2016 | Retention time case file will be retained | Retain | |
05/22/1985 | Letter filed | | |
07/01/1982 | Order entered | Refused | |
04/28/1982 | Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals | | |
04/22/1982 | Letter issued by the court | | |
04/12/1982 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |
03/12/1982 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/09/1981 | Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument | | |
06/02/1981 | Motion to reconsider filed | | |
06/02/1981 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |
06/02/1981 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |
06/02/1981 | Reporters record filed | | |
06/02/1981 | Clerks record filed | | |
01/31/1981 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/12/1982 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | |
Caldwell, Bobby | Criminal - Appellant |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 2
F80-5567-LI
45 years & $7500 fine