judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VICTOR L. McMURRY v. ROBYN LOVING McMURRY

Case Heading (S-10-0039)
Case Number:S-10-0039Case Docketed On:02/16/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:VICTOR L. McMURRY v. ROBYN LOVING McMURRY
Full Title:VICTOR L. McMURRY, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROBYN LOVING McMURRY, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantVictor L. McMurryWeston W. Reeves
Anna M. Reeves Olson
AppelleeRobyn Loving McMurryKim D. Cannon
Alison Ochs Gee

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Marriage and Divorce - Property Division
Opinion Number:2010 WY 163
Citation:245 P.3d 316

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/16/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/16/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/26/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/29/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/19/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/04/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Robyn Loving McMurry and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/22/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/23/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
06/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/02/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Deposition & Transcripts; Volumes III-IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kim Cannon for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - W.W. Reeves for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Weston W. Reeves for appellant; Kim D. Cannon for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/15/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/03/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/03/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/07/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/6/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal