judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RADCLIFFE B. LEWIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0439
Short Caption:RADCLIFFE B. LEWIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD3614-11Filed Date:03/31/2011

Opening Event Date:03/31/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/12/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRadcliffe B. LewisYPro SeY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/31/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/04/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL and NON-APPEALABLE ORDER... (BY: ETW)
05/04/2011TMC - OTSC - motion to file (LODGED) ROTSC
06/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to order to show cause
06/02/2011RECEIVED - aplt's response to the order to show cause (which is attached/included as part of the motion to late file)
06/20/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the LODGED RESPONSE. It is ****MORE****
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE
06/20/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that this APPEAL IS DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction as having been taken from a non-final order... (BRNGKG)
06/20/2011DISMISSED
08/12/2011FiledMandate