judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC THOMAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0412
Short Caption:ERIC THOMAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-21904-09Filed Date:03/25/2011

Opening Event Date:03/25/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/02/2012
Argued/Submitted:03/20/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/31/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric Thomas Y
James W. KleinNY
Shilpa S. SatoskarNY
Monica V. DouglasNN
Alice WangYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
David B. GoodhandYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/25/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/18/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/28/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (59 pgs/Swaringer) 10/23/09 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (161 pgs/Price) 8/19/10 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (216 pgs/Rogers) 8/25/10 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (227 pgs/Price) 8/26/10 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (101 pgs/Burr) 8/30/10 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (98 pgs/McCarn) 8/31/10 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (5 pgs/Etekochay) 11/29/10 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (85 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 11/30/10 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (86-283 pgs/Peterson- Hart) 12/1/10 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (218 pgs/Hunt) 12/6/10 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (136 pgs/Lindsay) 12/7/10 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (137-149 pgs/Lindsay) 12/8/10 proc.
06/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (24 pgs/tape) 2/24/11 proc. w/cd
06/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/15/2011RECORD INDEX
06/15/2011RECORD COPIES
06/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #14( memorandum file 8/25/10 & order sealing bench conference J. Beck filed 8/25/10) yellow sealed envelope
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief
07/28/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for extension to 10/24/11.
10/24/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief 1/23/12.
01/18/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
01/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 4/23/12.
04/17/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
05/01/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 7/16/12.
05/23/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #15 (246 pgs/Price) 8/23/10 proc.
05/23/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #16 (19 pgs/McCarn) 9/1/10 proc.
05/23/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #17 (32 pgs/Burr) 9/2/10 proc.
05/23/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #18 (12 pgs/Van Bremen) 9/3/10 proc.
05/23/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #19 (12 pgs/tape) 11/29/10 proc. w/cd
06/21/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #20 (20 pgs/tape) 11/30/10 proc. w/cd
07/11/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/11/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/02/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
08/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 10/9/12
10/02/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/02/2012FiledBriefing Completed
11/08/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
11/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
01/31/2013LodgedACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/12/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/13/2013FiledLetter From appellant public defender service stating that Alice Wang will be arguing the case (Appellant)
02/19/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
02/19/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
03/04/2013FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellee)Granted
03/05/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion To Postpone/Continue Argument
03/05/2013FiledCalendar notice sent
03/12/2013LodgedACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/20/2013FiledArgued before Judges Washington, Glickman, Pryor, Alice Wang, Esq. for appellant David B. Goodhand, Esq. for appellee
10/24/2013FiledReversed And Remanded (Opinion) (Washington, Chief Judge; Glickman, Associate Judge; and Pryor, Senior Judge)
10/29/2013FiledMotion to issue the mandate forthwith (Appellant)
10/31/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion to issue the mandate forthwith (Appellant).
10/31/2013FiledReversed And Remanded (AMENDED OPINION)
10/31/2013FiledMandate
02/07/2014FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent