judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JERELE CRAIG COTHREN, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0240)
Case Number:S-11-0240Case Docketed On:10/19/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:JERELE CRAIG COTHREN, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JERELE CRAIG COTHREN, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJerele Craig Cothren Jr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
Susan Gail O'Brien

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2012 WY 102
Citation:281 P.3d 352

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/19/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/02/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/05/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/06/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/06/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/02/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/03/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/08/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/22/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/01/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/01/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/01/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/30/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/30/2012Event - Phone Call to Appellate Division. The last address for Appellant was the WMCI in Torrington, inmate # 26473.EventPhone CallFinal
08/01/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 7/31/2012 by agent for Warden at WMCI.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/15/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/15/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/17/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/16/2012ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/20/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for 8/16/2012 by agent for Warden at WMCI.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal