judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CABRERA (DANIEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34990
Short Caption:CABRERA (DANIEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C145487Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/28/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/18/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-10098
11/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34922, 34923, 34928, 34942, 34949, 34990, 35002, 35006. 99-11152
02/28/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 02/25/00. 00-03072
02/28/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/20/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Supplemental record (preliminary hearing filed in the district court on October 10, 1997) due: 30 days. 01-10439
06/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 20, 2001, we directed the clerk of the district court to transmit to the clerk of this court, a certified copy of the transcript of the preliminary hearing held in this matter. We were subsequently informed that the record on appeal, filed on February 28, 2000, contains the requested transcript. We vacte our order entered on June 20, 2001. 01-10866
07/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-11788
08/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-11994
08/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. 01-11994