judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF ARNOLD WEINSTOCK

Case Information: 34979
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF ARNOLD WEINSTOCKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/15/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/15/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. 1 and 2. 99-10011
11/22/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from attorney Orin Grossman requesting docketing statement form. 99-11654
12/08/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-12309
03/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Petitioner shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file an opening brief and appendix, or show cause why this matter should not be dismissed as abandoned. 00-03789
03/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On March 10, 2000, this court entered an order directing petitioner Weinstock to file an opening brief and appendix within twenty days or show cause why this matter should not be dismissed as abandoned. We vacate the order entered on March 10, 2000. 00-04253
03/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. Weinstock shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief. Briefing shalll proceed with NRAP 31(a). We caution Weinstock that if he does not file an opening brief, then this matter will be submitted for decision on the record. 00-04256
04/03/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 3/31/00. 00-05277
04/03/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-05278
04/10/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for appellant's opening brief and appellant's appendix. 00-05669
04/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike or, Alternatively, Motion for Extension of Time. 00-06943
05/01/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Strike or, Alternatively, Motion for Extension of Time. 00-07018
06/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 28, 2000, bar counsel filed a motion to strike the opening brief and appendix, or alternatively, for an extension of time to file an answering brief. Weinstock filed an opposition to the motion on May 1, 2000. We deny the motion to strike. However, in reviewing this matter, this court will consider whether sanctions are warranted for any violations of the Rules of Appellate Procedure or Supreme Court Rules and will disregard any matters in the brief which are not supported by proper citation to the record and will likewise disregard any materials in the appendix that are not properly before this court. We grant bar counsel's alternative request for an extension of time to file the answering brief. Bar counsel shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief. Thereafter, brief shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a). 00-10317
07/06/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 7/5/00. 00-11517
10/23/2000Order/Dispositional BarFiled Bar Discipline Order. "Weinstock shall be suspended for a period of twelve months." This suspension shall run concurrently with the four-month suspension from this court's order of May 27, 1999, which was previously stayed. Weinstock shall pay the costs of this disciplinary proceedings and shall also complete six continuing legal education credits during the period of his suspension. As a condition of reinstatement, Weinstock shall be appointed a mentor approved by bar counsel for a period of twelve months. Weinstock and the state bar shall comply with the requirements of SCR 115. 00-18687
10/23/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
11/03/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Orin G. Grossman--check no. 56943.
11/03/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. (Petition includes motion for a stay of the order of suspension pending resolution of rehearing petition.) Mailed on: 11/2/00--FedEx. 00-19329
11/08/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for New Disciplinary Hearing. 00-19622
11/13/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Weinstock's Motion for Stay. 00-19817
11/20/2000MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike or, alternatively, Opposition to Weinstock's Motion for New Disciplinary Hearing. 00-20354
11/22/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Certificate of Service by Mail and Notice of Order to Public. 00-20578
12/04/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. Order Denying Rehearing and Denying Motion for New Hearing. " . . . the petition for rehearing and the motion for a new disciplinary rehearing are denied." Weinstock's motion for stay and the state bar's motion to strike are denied as moot in light of this order. En Banc-RR/CY/WM/MS/DA/ML/NB 00-21056
06/13/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of Arnold Weinstock. (Weinstock states that he complied with this court's order to notify his clients in October of 2000 and has otherwise complied with this court's order, but did not notify this court until now.) 02-10324