judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHIRLEY G. ROBINSON V. ASPEN OF DC, INC.

Case Information: 11-AA-0400
Short Caption:SHIRLEY G. ROBINSON V. ASPEN OF DC, INC.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00218-11Filed Date:03/30/2011

Opening Event Date:03/30/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/06/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/27/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerShirley G. Robinson YPro SeN
RespondentAspen of DC, Inc.N
Steven WilliamsNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/30/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
03/30/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
04/14/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to March 30, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
04/14/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
05/10/2011APPEARANCE of Atty Steven Williams for Respondent.
01/06/2012FiledRecord Completed
01/06/2012FiledRecord On Appeal w/hearing of 2/22/11
01/20/2012FiledBriefing Order
02/16/2012FiledReceived - order dated 1/20/12 sent to Steven Williams returned from post office. Called placed to confirm address. Phone not working. Order sent to file room. (Respondent)
03/02/2012FiledOrder directing motion, brief & limited appendix
03/15/2012FiledReceived - 3/2/12 order sent to respondent returned from post office. Sent to file room. (Respondent)
04/05/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
04/05/2012FiledDismissed
04/26/2012FiledReceived order from post office sent to attorney for petitioner (Petitioner) - sent to file room
04/27/2012FiledMandate