judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EARL D. WALLACE and NAWANA V. WALLACE v. PINNACLE BANK - WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0230)
Case Number:S-11-0230Case Docketed On:09/30/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:EARL D. WALLACE and NAWANA V. WALLACE v. PINNACLE BANK - WYOMING
Full Title:EARL D. WALLACE and NAWANA V. WALLACE, Appellants (Defendants), v. PINNACLE BANK - WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEarl D. WallaceStephen R. Winship
AppellantNawana V. WallaceStephen R. Winship
AppelleePinnacle Bank - WyomingMichael S. Messenger
Curtis H. Cheney

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Liens
Opinion Number:2012 WY 64
Citation:273 P.3d 1250

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/30/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/30/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/30/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/03/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Brief and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/16/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/16/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
12/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Brief and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/22/2011Motion - Extension of time - file response/objection - motion for extension of time to file reply brief.MotionExtension of time - file response/objectionFinal
12/30/2011Order - Denying Appellants' request for extension to file reply brief.OrderDenyFinal
01/03/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Extend Time fo File Appellants' Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/03/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/04/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/09/2012Event - Phone Call. Received call from district court clerk's office indicating that they may need more time to forward the record due to unforeseen circumstances.EventPhone CallFinal
01/11/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/12/2012Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
01/17/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/17/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Reschedule Oral ArgumentsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/17/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/17/2012Order - Oral argument - amending schedule. Oral argument rescheduled for 02/16/2012OrderOral argument - amending scheduleFinal
01/30/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Curtis Cheney obo Pinnacle BankNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/03/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Stephen R. Winship obo AppellantsNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/16/2012Event - Oral argument presentedEventOral argument presentedFinal
02/16/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before full court (Stephen Winship for appellants; Curtis Cheney and Michael Messenger, argument by Mr. Cheney for appellee)Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/11/2012Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
04/12/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthoritiesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/04/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming and remanding. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/16/2012Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
05/17/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Petition and Brief for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/30/2012Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
05/30/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/30/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/30/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/04/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/1/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal