judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LONELDON T. WINDSOR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0385
Short Caption:LONELDON T. WINDSOR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead:11-CO-0385Consolidated: 11-CO-0895
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL4853-97Filed Date:02/11/2011

Opening Event Date:02/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/12/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/27/2012
Argued/Submitted:01/31/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/23/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLoneldon T. Windsor YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
James M. Perez YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/04/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 11, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
04/12/2011RECORD INDEX
04/12/2011RECORD COPIES
04/12/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
05/13/2011ORDER DENYING APLT MO FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and limited appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: ETW)
06/08/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY
07/20/2011FiledORDERED that the motion for stay is hereby held in abeyacne for 90 days to permit the trial court to rule on the pending motion.
08/08/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals nos. 11-CO-385 and 11-CO-895 for all purposes herein, denying motion for stay for appellant in appeal no. 11-CO-385, directing record in appeal no. 11-CO-895 and briefing order
08/08/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/11/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CO-895)
08/11/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CO-895)
09/06/2011FiledBrief for both Appeals. (Appellant)(No Appendix attached).
03/15/2012FiledOrdered that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order file the limited appendix accompanied by a motion for leave and directing the brief of appellee withi n30 days from the date the limited appendix is filed with this court
03/30/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Limited Appendix (Appellant)Granted
04/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the limited appendix on or before July 23, 2012
06/20/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
07/19/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellee)Granted
07/24/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
08/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motions for extensions of time to file the brief on or before August 27, 2012
08/24/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/27/2012FiledBriefing Completed
09/07/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
10/03/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
11/26/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From Loneldon Windsor (Appellant)
12/03/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/31/2013FiledSubmitted to Judges Thompson, Beckwith, Belson
06/11/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
03/07/2014FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Beckwith, Associate Judges; and Belson, Senior Judge)
03/24/2014FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
05/15/2014FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc.
05/23/2014FiledMandate