judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK v. MICHAEL'S CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation

Case Heading (S-11-0210)
Case Number:S-11-0210Case Docketed On:09/12/2011
Linked To: S-11-0209
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK v. MICHAEL'S CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation
Full Title:AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK, Appellant (Defendant), v. MICHAEL'S CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAmerican National BankClint Andrew Langer
AppelleeMichael's Construction, Inc., a Wyoming corporationJames L. Edwards

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Liens, Other
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/12/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/12/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/28/2011Brief - Appellant and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
10/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - American National Bank's brief on cross-appeal; and statement of costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/22/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/03/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Transcripts & Exhibits; Volume V, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/11/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/17/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from James L. Edwards obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/20/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Clint A. Langer obo ANBNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/16/2012Event - Oral argument presentedEventOral argument presentedFinal
02/16/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before full court (James Edwards for appellant; Clint Langer for appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/31/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/18/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/18/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/21/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/20/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal