judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JENNINGS VS. EMMANS

Case Information: 34962
Short Caption:JENNINGS VS. EMMANSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9901119AClassification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/26/1999 / Hicks, LarrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/07/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/13/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Day R. Williams, Esq.--check no. 1106.
10/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09920
10/26/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry R. Hicks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/17/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-11426
02/01/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-01602
02/10/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/1/99. To Court Reporter: Constance Eisenberg. 00-02106
02/16/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Because this is a child custody matter, appellant shall have 90 days to file opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days after service of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 10 days after service of the answering brief to file and serve the reply brief. 00-02477
02/16/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/1/99. Court Reporter: Constance S. Eisenberg. 00-02487
03/09/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered (Reno/Carson) 3/9/00. 00-03750
03/09/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-03753
03/28/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 3/28/00. 00-04976
05/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's failure to file a reply brief is treated as a waiver of the right to file a reply brief. Accordingly, briefing is completed in this appeal. 00-07365
07/31/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Expedite Decision of Appeal (SCR 251). 00-13240
09/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted to the Northern Nevada panel for decision on the briefs, appendix and record filed in this matter. On July 31, 2000, appellant filed a "Motion to Expedite Decision of Appeal." We deny appellant's motion. Resolution of this appeal shall be expedited as the court's calendar allows. 00-15741
09/07/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered Jenning's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, we "ORDER the district court's judgment affirmed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-19964
12/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19989
12/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/22/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 13, 2000. 00-19989