judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEBARR (BRIAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34969
Short Caption:DEBARR (BRIAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 27617 , 33116 , 36890 , 37486 , 44917 , 46833 , 51574 , 63596 , 67579 , 67579-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C109793Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/07/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/14/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-09956
10/14/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
11/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: October 25, 1999. 99-10697
11/03/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
11/12/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-11175
01/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request. 00-00302
01/18/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 12/07/92; 12/10/92; 12/18/92; 01/28/93; 01/29/93; 09/08/93; 10/11/93; 10/25/93; 11/03/93; 11/17/93; 11/29/93; 12/01/93; 12/02/93; 12/03/93; 12/06/93; 12/27/93; 12/28/93; 12/30/93; 03/24/93; 11/22/93; 11/24/93; 11/29/93; 12/27/93; 12/30/93; 01/03/93; 01/25/93; 01/27/93; 02/17/93; 04/12/93; 04/28/93; 05/17/93 01/05/94; 03/03/94; 03/04/94; 05/22/95; 06/22/95 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporters: Donna J. Antonacci, Russell A. Garcia, Sharon J. Thielman, Lisa Brenske, Marcia J. Leonard, Lori M. Judd, and Donna S. Little. 00-00758
03/01/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-03214
03/15/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall forthwith strike appellant's transcript request form filed on January 18, 2000. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, serve a copy of this order on all court reporters named in the transcript request form and file proof of such service with this court; either file with this court an amended transcript request or a certificate of no transcript request. We grant appellant's motion filed March 1, 2000. Appellant's opening brief shall be filed on or before 30 days from the date of this order. 00-04087
03/24/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing on Order filed 3/15/00. 00-04742
03/24/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-04743
04/17/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 4/15/00. 00-06100
05/18/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-08293
05/18/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-08294
05/30/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Appellant's Reply Brief.
06/07/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 6/5/00. 00-09602
06/07/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. 00-09603
06/07/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that the district court properly denied the petition. "We therefore affirm the district court's order denying appellant's post-convictin petition for a writ of habeas corpus." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-19081
11/28/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19421
11/28/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 14, 2000. 00-19421
04/08/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Receipt of Original Files. 02-06206