judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANNE UHR WHITE v. SHANE EDEBURN CONSTRUCTION, LLC; PARIS L. EDEBURN; and PAUL B. TOZER and SHANE EDEBURN

Case Heading (S-11-0218)
Case Number:S-11-0218Case Docketed On:09/20/2011
Linked To: S-11-0219
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:ANNE UHR WHITE v. SHANE EDEBURN CONSTRUCTION, LLC; PARIS L. EDEBURN; and PAUL B. TOZER and SHANE EDEBURN
Full Title:ANNE UHR WHITE, Appellant (Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff), v. SHANE EDEBURN CONSTRUCTION, LLC; PARIS L. EDEBURN; and PAUL B. TOZER, Appellees (Plaintiffs), and SHANE EDEBURN, Appellee (Third-Party Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAnne Uhr White Pro Se
AppelleeShane Edeburn Construction, LLCKaren Budd Falen
Brandon Lee Jensen
AppelleeParis L. EdeburnKaren Budd Falen
Brandon Lee Jensen
AppelleePaul B. TozerKaren Budd Falen
Brandon Lee Jensen
AppelleeShane EdeburnKaren Budd Falen
Brandon Lee Jensen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts
Opinion Number:2012 WY 118
Citation:285 P.3d 949

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/20/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/20/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/28/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/28/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/19/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/19/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/01/2012Motion - Extension of time - brief (third)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/02/2012Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
02/21/2012Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
02/22/2012Event - Hardcopy received Appellees' Motion to Dismiss AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/07/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/12/2012Response/Objection - Motion - Appellant's objection to motion to dismiss.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
03/21/2012Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss AppealOrderDenyFinal
04/20/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/23/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees Shane Edeburn Construction, LLC, Paris L. Edeburn, Paul B. Tozer, and Shane Edeburn; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/25/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/08/2012Brief - Appellant reply (Appellant included copy of Circuit Court Pleadings in SC-2011-370)BriefAppellant replyFinal
05/09/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/09/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/17/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/07/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/25/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/25/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/27/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for by district court clerk's office.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal