judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MAURICE NACCACHE, M.D. V. ANGELA M. TAYLOR

Case Information: 11-CV-0392
Short Caption:MAURICE NACCACHE, M.D. V. ANGELA M. TAYLORClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAM8012-07Filed Date:03/22/2011

Opening Event Date:03/22/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/05/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/14/2012
Argued/Submitted:11/15/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/05/2015

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMaurice Naccache N
Todd S. KimNY
Alex Karpinski NN
Carl J. SchifferleYY
AppelleeAngela M. Taylor N
Keith W. DonahoeYY
Frank R. KearneyNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/22/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/06/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 22, 2011, and it appering that transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
05/03/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 6, 2011, directing appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 20 days, and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (JAC) elp
06/02/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
06/02/2011RECEIVED - aplt's statement regarding transcripts and statement of issues
06/09/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript of appellant is filed. It is (MORE)
06/09/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED 9/23/10, 10/12-10-10/21/10)
06/09/2011STATEMENT OF ISSUE(S) *to determine if trial court erred in denying Dr. Naccache a new trial
06/09/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, bu the Clerk of the Superior Court, the record index and transcripts required by D.C. App.R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (46-pgs/janifer 9/23/10 pr'c.)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (187-pgs/mccarn 10/12/10 proc.)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (58-pgs/hill 10/12/10 proc.)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (24-pgs/hill 10/13/10 proc.)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (206-pgs/hill 10/13/10 proc.)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#6 (193-pgs/mccarn 10/14/10 proc.)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#7 (208-pgs/mccarn 10/18/10 proc.)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#8 (67-pgs/geddes 10/19/10 proc.)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#9 (154-pgs/gesses 10/19/10 proc.)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#10 (212-pgs/mccarn 10/20/10 proc.)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#11 (15-pgs/mccarn 10/21/10 proc.)w/cd
07/05/2011RECORD COMPLETED
07/08/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
07/13/2011FiledMotion to hold in abeyance (Appellant)Granted
07/20/2011FiledRecord Index
07/20/2011FiledRecord Copies
07/25/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion to hold in abeyance (Appellant) and F/O that Counsel for Appellant shall advise this court within 15 days of the scheduled mediation session of the status of mediation or settlement.
08/05/2011FiledStatement regarding Status of Mediation Proceedings (Appellant)
09/19/2011FiledMotion - to lift stay of appeal and for briefing order (Appellant)Granted
09/21/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion - to lift stay of appeal (Appellant)
09/21/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File and appendix Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/26/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File and appendix Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix for an additional 45 days (no oppo). Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/21/2011FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (no oppo). (Appellant)Granted
11/30/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Supplement The Record (no oppo). (Appellant)
11/30/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix for an additional 45 days (no oppo). Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
12/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record #12 (video depositon of Clarice Woods Conducted on 10/7/10 & Julia Muskie, MD 10/8/10_
01/12/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/19/2012FiledOpposition to appellant's motion for extention of time (Appellee)
01/26/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
02/07/2012FiledMotion For Leave To File Excess-Paged Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/09/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO FILE LODGED BRIEF IN EXCESS PAGES & MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX
02/28/2012FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION and the CLERK SHALL FILE THE BRIEF AND APPENDIX and APPELLEE SHALL FILE THE BRIEF IN 30 DAYS
02/28/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
02/28/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant) Vol I. thru Vol. III
02/28/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
03/01/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
04/05/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
04/05/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)Granted
04/05/2012FiledMotion For Leave To File Excess-Paged Brief (Appellee)
04/10/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (amended) (Appellee)Granted
04/11/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING//MOTION TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS PAGES//MOTION TO SUPP//AMENDED MOTION TO SUPP
04/17/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File response for extention of time to file response to motion for leave to supplement the record. (Appellant)Granted
04/19/2012FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION and APPELLANT'S RESPONSE SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN APRIL 27, 2012
04/27/2012FiledNotice Received from appellant of joint stipulation regarding the appelle's motion for leave to supplement the record (Appellant)
05/15/2012FiledNotice Received from the appellant consenting to appellee's motion for leave to supplement the record (Titled: Joint stipulation regarding the appellee's motion for leave to supplement the record) (Appellant)
05/15/2012FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTIONS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - TO FILE A BRIEF IN EXCESS PAGES - TO FILE a SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX - and - TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD and APPELLEE'S BRIEF THAT DOES NOT EXCEED 57 PAGES SHALL BE FILED W/N 30 DAYS and APPELLEE MAY INCLUDE APPELLANT'S DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT IN THE SUPP REC
06/14/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
06/14/2012FiledSupplemental Appendix (Appellee)
06/14/2012FiledBriefing Completed
07/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
07/09/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/09/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)
07/16/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
08/08/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/13/2012FiledOpposition to appellant's fifth request for an extension of time. (Appellee)
08/15/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)
09/10/2012LodgedReply Brief (Appellant)
09/10/2012FiledMotion For Leave To File Excess-Paged Brief (Appellant)Denied
09/17/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO FILE LODGED REPLY BRIEF IN EXCESS PAGES
09/21/2012FiledMotion for additional time for argument. (Appellee)
09/26/2012FiledORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO FILE the LODGED REPLY BRIEF IN EXCESS PAGES and APPELLANT MAY FILE A CONFORMING BRIEF W/N 20 DAYS
10/01/2012FiledMotion To Reconsider order denying leave to file lodged reply brief and conditional motion for extension of time to file reply brief (Appellant)Granted
10/02/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION//OPPO
10/02/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/05/2012FiledOpposition to appellant's motion for reconsideration (Appellee)
10/09/2012FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION and APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF that DOES NOT EXCEED 23 PAGES SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 19, 2012
10/19/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
11/15/2012FiledArgued before Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Easterly, Reid
02/26/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
03/12/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
07/25/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Blackburne-Risgby and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge.)
08/06/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc and bill of cost Other (Appellant)Granted
08/16/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET and appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc shall be filed on or before August 29, 2013. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the joint motion for an extension of time to file a bill of costs is granted to the extent that the bill of cost shall be filed once the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc has been resolved. (ETW)
08/29/2013FiledMotion To File Excess-Paged Petition (Appellant)Granted
09/20/2013FiledOrdered that appellee, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto.
10/04/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File to exceed the page limits ( appellee)Granted
10/10/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (appellant)
10/15/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
01/23/2014FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
02/05/2014FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
05/20/2014FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
05/23/2014FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
06/02/2014FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
12/16/2014FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
12/16/2014FiledAnswer/Response to appellant's petition for rehearing and rehearing en banc (Appellant)
12/16/2014FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for leave to exceed the page limit for the lodged petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc, and appellee's motion for leave to exceed the page limit for the lodged response to appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
12/16/2014FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
12/30/2014FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Appellee)Granted
01/05/2015FiledMandate
01/08/2015FiledTMC//MOTION FOR COSTS//lodged OPPO
01/23/2015FiledOpposition to motion for costs (Appellant)
01/23/2015FiledORDER, SS, FILING the lodged OPPO and F/O GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR COSTS ($1278.91)...