judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KINGMAN (GERALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34968
Short Caption:KINGMAN (GERALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9900632CClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/14/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09954
11/17/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11399
12/14/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-12554
12/14/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/17/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 15, 1999. 99-12554