judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

AMERICAN INDEMNITY COMPANY, INVESTMENTS OF SHER-DEN, INC., PALA, INC. AND ROWTON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. v. C. HAYMAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, ET AL.

Case: B-2747
B-2747
05/26/1971
Certified Question from the U. S. Court of Appeals
AMERICAN INDEMNITY COMPANY, INVESTMENTS OF SHER-DEN, INC., PALA, INC. AND ROWTON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.
C. HAYMAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/30/1971Errata FiledPetitioner
06/28/1971Certified Question filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/06/1971Opinion issued
07/05/1971Response to Motion filed
06/30/1971Errata Filed
06/28/1971Certified Question filed
05/26/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
American Indemnity Company, Investments of Sher-Den, Inc., Pala, Inc. and Rowton Construction Company, Inc.Petitioner
C. Hayman Construction Company, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information