judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JALONTE LITTLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0765
Short Caption:JALONTE LITTLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Carjacking
Lead:10-CF-0765Consolidated: 13-CO-0481
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-22821-08Filed Date:06/21/2010

Opening Event Date:06/21/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/28/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/31/2013
Argued/Submitted:04/15/2014
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/04/2015
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJalonte LittleY
Debra L. SoltisYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
John P. MannarinoNY
Heather L. Carlton NN
John V. Geise NN
L. Jackson Thomas, IIYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/21/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Debra Soltis, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/20/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Debra Soltis, Esquire
08/19/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (18 pgs/Armstrong) 3/10/10 proc. (incomplete)
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (162 pgs/Armstrong) 3/11/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (45 pgs/Gilliam) 3/15/10 proc.
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (45 pgs/tape) 5/21/10 proc. cd attached
10/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/07/2010RECORD INDEX
10/07/2010RECORD COPIES
10/07/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (SEALED documents)
11/03/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until February 24, 2011 (no oppo)
11/12/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 24, 2011. (JAC)
01/31/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF pending completion of transcript. no oppo
03/07/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, wherein appellant indicate(s) that transcript is being prepared, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court within 15 days thereof of appellant's receipt of the ordered transcript. (JAC)
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (100 pgs/Armstrong) 3/10/10 proc. w/CD
05/03/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 7, 2011, wherein appellant was directed to file the brief within 40 days from the date the trancsript is filed with this court, and it appearing that the transcript has been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall file the brief and limited appendix within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF pending completion of rt's. no oppo
08/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix. (for RT reasons)
09/28/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (28 pgs/Armstrong) 3/10/10 proc. w/cd
09/28/2011FiledRECORD COMPLETED
10/07/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/04/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for 60 days (no oppo). Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/16/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 1/16/12.
01/11/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/20/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 2/15/12.
02/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
02/21/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 4/16/12.
04/17/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
04/17/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
05/11/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
05/16/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 6/4/12
06/04/2012FiledBrief/ cd (Appellee)
06/04/2012FiledBriefing Completed
06/15/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
06/22/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant) to 8/1/12
06/25/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/02/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/12/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
07/16/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
08/01/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/02/2012FiledMemorandum - John Geise will argue in place of Heather Carlton (Appellee)
10/18/2012FiledMotion To Stay Appeal and oral argument pending decision on section 23-110 motion (Appellant)Granted
10/24/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Stay Appeal
11/29/2012FiledStatement regarding state of 23-110 motion (Appellant)
03/01/2013FiledStatus Report regarding pending 23-110 motion (Appellant)
04/26/2013FiledStatus Report regarding pending 23-110 motion (Appellant)
05/01/2013FiledOrder Sua Sponte directing counsel for appellant to file a response.
05/06/2013FiledResponse to May 1, 2013 order regarding 23-110 motion (Appellant)
05/10/2013FiledOrder Sua Sponte vacating stay, consolidating, directing transcripts, supplementing record.
05/10/2013FiledProceed With Appeal; No Longer On Hold/Stayed
05/10/2013FiledBriefing Order for 13-CO-481
05/14/2013FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (10 pgs/Lindsay) 4/11/13 proc. w/cd
05/15/2013FiledRecord Copies (13-CO-481)
05/15/2013FiledRecord Index (13-CO-481)
05/17/2013FiledSupplemental Record - #9 (Court pleadings) ***SEALED***
06/18/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (13-CO-481) (Appellant)Granted
07/03/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to extend time to file brief.
09/26/2013FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/26/2013FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/31/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
11/08/2013FiledOrder Granting aple's motion for ext to file responsive brief.
12/31/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/31/2013FiledBriefing Completed
01/02/2014FiledMotion to file a corrected brief (Appellee)Granted
01/14/2014FiledOrder Granting aple's motion to file corrected brief.
01/14/2014FiledAmended/Corrected Brief (Appellee)
01/16/2014FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/11/2014FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to extend time to file reply brief.
02/27/2014FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/24/2014FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
04/15/2014FiledArgued Before Assoicate Judge Blackburne-Rigsby, Assoicate Judge Beckwith,and Senior Judge Belson.(Debra L. Soltis,Esq.)(L. Jackson Thomas,Esq.)
11/12/2015FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Associate Judges; and Belson, Senior Judge)
12/04/2015FiledMandate (10-CF-765)