judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONALD S. QUINN v. SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES

Case Heading (06-194)
Case Number:06-194Case Docketed On:08/23/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:DONALD S. QUINN v. SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES
Full Title:DONALD S. QUINN, Appellant (Claimant), v. SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonald S. QuinnWilliam G. Hibbler
AppelleeSecuritas Security ServicesKeith Robert Nachbar

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 91
Citation:158 P.3d 711

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/23/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/23/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/23/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/23/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/31/2006Event - Phone Call from Kristi Radosevich; Division was not a party in this case and will not file a brief. She will send a letter to the Court formalizing notification.EventPhone CallFinal
09/01/2006Correspondence - Incoming on behalf of Workers' Compensation Division; have not been a party to proceedings and does not intend to participate in appeal. Caption revised and copy sent to parties.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
09/26/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of recordBriefAppellantFinal
11/13/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
11/15/2006Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from appelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
11/20/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/04/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/11/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, Agency Record; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/11/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/30/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court; Justice Hill filed a dissenting opinion in which Justice Kite joinedOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/01/2007Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
06/11/2007Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
06/19/2007Order - Awarding attorney fees and costs to Bill G. Hibbler, counsel for the claimant.OrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
06/27/2007Order - Awarding attorney fees and costs to Keith R. Nachbar, counsel for the employer.OrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
06/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/27/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/27/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/29/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 6/28/07 by Barbara Haus.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal