judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONOVAN (DONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34725
Short Caption:DONOVAN (DONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36867
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR95P1101Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07983
09/20/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-08879
09/20/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-08880
09/29/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response/Confession of Error. 99-09316
10/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. We agree with the parties and " . . . remand this case for an evidentiary hearing on the claims raised in appellant's petition." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-10178
11/16/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-11283
11/16/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/24/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 22, 1999. 99-11283