Case: 01-84-00671-CV
01-84-00671-CV
10/24/1984
Injunction
Blankfield, Dr. Jack J.
The Texas State Board of Dental Examiners
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/04/1986 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
10/24/1985 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Grant motion | |
10/04/1985 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
09/26/1985 | Stay issuance of mandate | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
09/06/1985 | Stay issuance of mandate | | |
07/11/1985 | Stay issuance of mandate | Grant motion | |
06/24/1985 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
06/20/1985 | Stay issuance of mandate | | |
06/19/1985 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
05/08/1985 | Higher court decision | Refused | |
04/08/1985 | Petition for writ of error from trial court | | |
03/07/1985 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
02/28/1985 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
02/14/1985 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/21/1985 | Submitted | | |
01/17/1985 | Brief filed | | |
01/17/1985 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
01/04/1985 | Reset submission date | | |
12/06/1984 | Submission | | |
11/21/1984 | Brief filed | | |
10/24/1984 | Statement of facts filed | | |
10/24/1984 | Transcript filed | | |
08/22/1984 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/04/1986 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Appellee | |
State | Appellant | |
State | Appellee |
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
82-41,205