judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EFFROS VS. PASSOVOY

Case Information: 34724
Short Caption:EFFROS VS. PASSOVOYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A383410Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Robinson, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/13/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mandelbaum and Gentile, Ltd.--check no. 8534.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07982
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David K. Robinson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/26/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-10489
11/19/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-11532
12/06/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-12141
12/06/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-12149
02/22/2000Notice/IncomingReceived Notice. Appellants' Supplement to Record on Appeal. 00-02766
03/15/2000MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Appellant's Supplement to Record on Appeal. 00-04086
03/20/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 3/17/00. 00-04374
03/20/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-04375
03/27/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. 00-04824
03/28/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 15, 2000. 00-04917
03/31/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Strike Appellnats' Supplement to Record on Appeal. 00-05249
04/17/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter, Respondent's Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike Appellants' Supplement to Record on Appeal. (pursuant to NRAP 27(a))
04/26/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Respondent's Motion to Request Permission to File a Reply Pursuant to NRAP 27(a). 00-06758
05/08/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 5/5/00. 00-07449
06/02/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On February 22, 2000, appellants submitted a document entitled "Appellants' Supplement to Record on Appeal". On March 15, 2000, respondent moved to strike appellants' Supplement. On March 31, 2000, appellants filed an opposition to respondent's motion to strike. We deny rrespondent's motion to strike. However, in doing so we express no opinion regarding whether the exhibits to appellants' supplement are properly before this court. Upon consideration of all briefs and arguments in this appeal we will disregard any material beyond the scope of appellant review. The clerk of the court shall forthwith file appellants' supplement and attached exhibits submitted on February 22, 2000. 00-09314
06/02/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Appellants' Supplement to Record on Appeal. 00-02766
06/06/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 6/5/00. 00-09492
06/12/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. To Reply Brief. 00-09890
03/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-04501
03/13/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB
04/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-05896
05/02/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-06066
05/02/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2001. 01-06066