judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL L. MYERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0764
Short Caption:MICHAEL L. MYERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-18675-09Filed Date:06/18/2010

Opening Event Date:06/18/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/07/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/24/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/27/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael L. Myers Y
James W. KleinNY
Fleming TerrellYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John P. Gidez YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/18/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/07/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/08/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
09/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (167 pgs/McCarn) 3/25/10 proc.
09/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (168-325 pgs/McCarn) 3/26/10 proc.
09/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (10 pgs/Richer) 5/28/10 proc. CD attached
09/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (78 pgs/Ott) 3/29/10 proc.
09/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/09/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ) For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk
09/14/2010RECORD INDEX
09/14/2010RECORD COPIES
09/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (request from removal from PSA supervision report filed--11/25/09.) SEALED
10/19/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
10/21/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before Janaury 17, 2011. (JAC)
01/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
01/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 18, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (5 pgs/tape) 3/25/10 proc.
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
04/26/2011ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 18, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (ETW)
07/18/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
07/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to 10/9/11 or to show cause.
10/07/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/07/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
11/04/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until December 7, 2011 (Appellee)
11/16/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time for an extension o ftime within which to file the brief to 12/7/11.
12/07/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/07/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/31/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
02/14/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/07/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)Granted
03/27/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for oral argument.
04/09/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
04/17/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
04/17/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
04/24/2012FiledArgued Before Glickman,Oberly,Belson Fleming Terrell Esq.,for the appellant John P. Gidez Esq.,for the appellee
09/06/2012FiledVacated In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (GLickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge)
09/17/2012FiledMotion to expedite issuance of the mandate (Appellant)Granted
09/17/2012FiledMotion to publish (Appellant)Granted
09/27/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion to publish, and appellant's motion to expedite issuance of the mandate.
09/27/2012FiledVacated In Part/Remanded In Part (OPINION) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges; Belson, Senior Judge.)
09/27/2012FiledMandate