judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THREE SONS, LLC v. WYOMNG OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH AND SAFETY COMMISSION (OSHA)

Case Heading (06-228)
Case Number:06-228Case Docketed On:10/06/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:THREE SONS, LLC v. WYOMNG OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH AND SAFETY COMMISSION (OSHA)
Full Title:THREE SONS, LLC, Appellant (Petitioner), v. WYOMING OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH AND SAFETY COMMISSION (OSHA), Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThree Sons, LLCJohn R. Hursh
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Worker's Safety DivisionPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 93
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/06/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/06/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/08/2006Correspondence - Incoming - copy of letter from counsel for appellant regarding record on appeal.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/08/2006Correspondence - Incoming - letter from district court clerk amending notice of completion of record.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/15/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/28/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/29/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/11/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/16/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Filing of recordNotice-IncomingFiling of recordFinal
01/17/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/07/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/25/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/25/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal