Case: C-3560
C-3560
11/05/1984
App Writ of Error
VIVIAN BALES BEATTY
GREGORY BALES
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/06/1984 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
11/05/1984 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/02/1985 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | | | |
12/05/1984 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Refused. No Reversible Error | | |
11/07/1984 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
11/06/1984 | Reply to Response | | | |
11/05/1984 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/02/1985 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-83-00366-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
677 Sw2d 750
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable Pete Tijerina
Trial Court Information
38th District Court
Uvalde
13,008