Case: 05-84-01231-CR
05-84-01231-CR
11/02/1984
Sexual Abuse, Rape or Injury of a Child
Murphy, Jr., Patrick Henry
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/18/2018 | Retention time case file will be retained | Retain | |
07/15/2003 | Record Returned | | |
07/11/2003 | Pulled from storage | | |
08/06/1986 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/31/1986 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |
09/20/1985 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | Refused | |
08/06/1985 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/19/1985 | Submitted | | |
06/12/1985 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
06/07/1985 | MattConv | | |
05/03/1985 | Brief Filed | | |
04/04/1985 | MattConv | | |
04/03/1985 | Brief Filed | | |
03/05/1985 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
03/05/1985 | Transcript Filed | | |
03/04/1985 | MattConv | | |
01/25/1985 | MattConv | | |
01/15/1985 | MattConv | | |
11/02/1984 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/06/1986 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 5
Dallas
F84-85489-RL
50 yrs TDC