judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SATTLEY (STEVEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32430
Short Caption:SATTLEY (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C102630Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/20/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/29/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. clerk 5
05/29/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
05/29/1998OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. sat in district court proceedings.
07/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] The clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. Records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 32316,32369,32409,32410,32430,32464,32471,32482
11/20/1998Other Other. Case submitted on the Record on Appeal this day.
11/20/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (copy).
11/20/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15271
09/26/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15440
09/26/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. 00-15440