judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF DANIEL J. DAVID, AN EMPLOYEE OF PDQ TRANSPORT, INC.: DANIEL J. DAVID v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION,

Case Heading (06-101)
Case Number:06-101Case Docketed On:05/05/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF DANIEL J. DAVID, AN EMPLOYEE OF PDQ TRANSPORT, INC.: DANIEL J. DAVID v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION,
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF DANIEL J. DAVID, AN EMPLOYEE OF PDQ TRANSPORT, INC.: DANIEL J. DAVID, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDaniel J. DavidSean W. Scoggin
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 22
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/05/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/05/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/05/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/05/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/16/2006Brief - Appellant (Presented with designation of record for filing, advised it is pleading that is filed in the district court)BriefAppellantFinal
07/28/2006Brief - Appellee; received designation of record on appeal and brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
08/11/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/24/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency RecordRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/08/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/12/2007Motion - Other - combined motion for payment of attorney's fees and costs, affidavit supporting same and notice of objection; and received proposed orderMotionOtherFinal
03/06/2007Order - Other -awarding attorney's fees and costsOrderOtherFinal
03/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/06/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal