judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSE CONTRERAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0790
Short Caption:JOSE CONTRERAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL6302-02Filed Date:06/23/2010

Opening Event Date:06/23/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/26/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/20/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/25/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/19/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJose Contreras Y
Paul Y. KiyonagaYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/23/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/26/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4(b). (BY: ETW)
08/12/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
08/31/2010 ORDERED that the JULY 26, 2010 OTSC IS HEREBY DISCHARGED. It is *****MORE*****
08/31/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the SRT available for completion online.... (BY: ETW) lw
09/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
10/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (41 pgs/Salazar) 11/24/03 proc. w/cd
10/26/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/03/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/03/2010RECORD INDEX
11/03/2010RECORD COPIES
12/09/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 90 days
12/20/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before March 14, 2011. (By: JAC)
03/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 15, 2011 (no oppo)
03/17/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before April 18, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/18/2011APPENDIX
05/20/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/20/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/27/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
06/10/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF NO OPPO for 30 days
06/27/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and appellant's reply brief shall be filed on or before July 15, 2011. (By: JAC)
07/15/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/12/2011FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)
09/26/2011FiledOrder Denying aplt's request for oral argument.
10/25/2011FiledSubmitted To Blackburne-Rigsby,Schwelb
02/23/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
03/19/2012FiledMandate