judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAMPTON (ANTHONY TERRELL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32378
Short Caption:HAMPTON (ANTHONY TERRELL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40056 , 41661 , 42043 , 42270
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C140474Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/09/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/20/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
05/22/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Certified copy of notice of appeal pack - Identical to pack filed on 5/20/98.
05/26/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. To file case appeal statement. Due date: 10 days.
11/06/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file the case appeal statement, docketing statement, transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request, opening brief and appendix or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon appellant's counsel, Karen E. Brasier.
03/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Attorney Brasier's failure to prosecute this appeal or to respond in any manner to our Novmeber 6, 1998, order is unacceptable and warants the imposition of sanctions. Attorney Brasier shall personally pay the sum of $100 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with proof of payment within 15 days of the date of this order. Attorney brasier shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file the documents referred to above (case appeal statement, a docketing statement, a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request, an opening brief and an appendix) or show cause why additional sanctions should not be imposed against her. Failure to comply with this order may result in her referral to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation and, if appropriate, disciplinary action. (Order mailed to attorney Brasier by regular and certified mail.)
04/20/1999MotionFiled Motion. For reconsideration of order dated March 30, 1999.
04/21/1999MotionFiled Motion. Amended motion for reconsideration of order dated March 30, 1999.
03/29/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Vacating previous order imposing sanctions. We grant attorney Brasier's motion for reconsideration and hereby vacate the order imposing sanctions entered on March 30, 1999. Attorney Catherine Woolf shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, serve and file with the clerk of this court the following documents: (1) a notice of appearance; (2) the docketing statement; and (3) a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request; shall serve and file the opening brief and appendix within 40 days from the date of this order. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31 (a)(1). Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions, including referral of this matter to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation. (Docketing statement mailed to attorney Woolf.)
05/03/2000MotionFiled Motion. For appointment of counsel.
06/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 3, 2000, attorney Woolf filed a "Motion for Appointment of Counsel." We treat attorney Woolf's motion as her notice of appearance before this court as appellant's counsel in her capacity as a Deputy Clark County Public Defender. We again direct attorney Woolf, within 20 days of the date of this order, to serve and file the docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request and within 40 days from the date of this order, to serve and file the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Failure to comply with this second order directing the filing of the aboverequired documents may result in the imposition of sanctions, including, but not limited to,referral of this matter to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-10697
07/13/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/13/97, 4/29/97, 7/14/97, 10/29/97, 1/21/98, 2/11/98, 3/4/98, 3/9/98, 4/3/98, 4/13/98 - 4/15/98 and 5/13/98. To Court Reporters: Arlene Blasi c/o Janice Liston, Maureen Schorn and Pauline May. 00-12105
07/13/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-12106
07/19/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment filed 6/16/98. Due Date: 10 days
07/24/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Recorder's Transcript re: Calendar Call, Thursday, March 13, 1997; 9:00 a.m. and Defendant's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Tuesday, April 29, 1997; 9:00 a.m. Court Recorder: Alice Blazi. 00-12772
07/31/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial) filed in district court on June 16, 1998. 00-13245
07/31/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 01/21/98; 03/04/98; 04/03/98; and 05/13/98. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 00-13246
08/23/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-14785
08/29/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 13, 2000, appellant filed a transcript request form requesting the preparation of transcripts by court reporters Alice Blazi, Maureen Schorn, and Pauline May. Court reporter May shall have twenty (20) days from the date of this order to file and serve the remaining requested transcripts (July 14, 1997; October 29, 1997; January 21, 1998; February 11, 1998; March 9, 1998; April 13-15, 1998), to file a motion for an extension of time to do so, or to inform this court in writing why the requested transcripts cannot be produced. We grant appellant's motion for a 60 day extension of time within which to file the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall have to and including October 2, 2000, within which to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. 00-15135
08/30/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 14, 1997; October 29, 1997; February 11, 1998; March 9, 1998; April 13-15, 1998. Court Reporter: Pauline C. May. 00-15250
12/04/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-21088
12/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall forthwith file the opening brief and appendix submitted provisionally on December 4, 2000. We admonish appellant's counsel for failing to timely respond to this court's orders. Future failure to comply with this court's orders may result in the imposition of sanctions. 00-21669
12/12/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express mail-no postmark. 00-21091
12/12/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-21094
01/10/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 12, 2001. 01-00597
02/14/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 02/12/01. 01-02934
02/14/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-02936
03/14/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 15, 2001. 01-04555
05/07/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On March 14, 2001, this court approved the parties' stipulation granting appellant an extension of time to April 15, 2001, to file a reply brief. To date, appellant has failed to file a reply brief. Briefing is deemed completed in this appeal. 01-07564
11/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-18709
11/09/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
12/04/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Order Affirming in Part and Vacating in Part. We conclude that the district court's decision to deny Hampton's motion to dismiss was correct. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED with respect to its limitation on the scope of cross-examination testimony and denial of Hampton's motion to dismiss and VACATED with respect to Hampton's conviction for kidnapping." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20289
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20346
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2002. 01-20346