judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAYMOND DEAN BROWN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-251)
Case Number:06-251Case Docketed On:10/30/2006
Linked To: S-07-0127
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:RAYMOND DEAN BROWN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RAYMOND DEAN BROWN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRaymond Dean BrownDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Jurisdiction, Post-Conviction Relief
Opinion Number:2008 WY 9
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/30/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/30/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/01/2006Motion - Appointment of counsel - pro se "motion giving notice of a conflict of interest with current court appointed counsel Donna Domonkos, and motion for appointment of substitute appellate counsel."MotionAppointment of counselFinal
12/12/2006Order - Deny - motion for appointment of substitute appellate counsel.OrderDenyFinal
12/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/19/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/31/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/01/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/16/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/19/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/02/2007Motion - Appointment of counsel - pro se "motion giving notice of a conflict of interest with current court appointed counsel David Westling and motion requesting appointment of substitute counsel outside of the Wyoming Appellate Division."MotionAppointment of counselFinal
04/09/2007Motion - For stay and remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
04/10/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/11/2007Order - Grant - fourth extension of time - brief of appellant - no furtherOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/11/2007Order - Deny - motion for substitute counsel.OrderDenyFinal
04/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Other - sent copies of filed documents to Sweetwater County Attorney.Notice-OutgoingOtherFinal
04/17/2007Order - Deny - motion for stay of proceeeding and remand to district court.OrderDenyFinal
04/30/2007Motion - Reconsideration - Pro se "motion to alter or amend judgment pursuant to W.R.C.P. Rule 59(e) (or any other applicable rule or statute). In laymans Terms, motion for reconsideration."MotionReconsiderationFinal
04/30/2007Motion - Other - pro se "motion giving notice that this appeal action (No. 06-251) has been mistakenly docketed prematurely before the Wyoming Supreme Court, and motion seeking appropriate judicial actions consistent with the protections afforded by procedural due process regarding same."MotionOtherFinal
05/11/2007Motion - Appointment of counsel - "Revised motion giving notice of a conflict of interest with current court appointed counsel David Westling, and renewed request for appointment of substitute appellate counsel outside the office of the Wyoming Public Defenders - appellate division."MotionAppointment of counselFinal
05/18/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
05/23/2007Order - Denying pro se motions: "Motion to alter or amend judgment pursuant to W.R.C.P. Rule 59(e) (or any other applicable rule or statute) in laymans terms, motion for reconsideration"; Motion giving notice that this appeal action (No. 06-251) has been mistakenly docketed prematurely before the Wyoming Supreme Court and motion seeking appropriate judicial actions consistent with the protections afforded by procedureal due process regarding same"; and "Revised Motion Giving Notice of a Conflict of Interest with Current Court Appointed Counsel David Westling, and Renewed Request for Appointment of Substitute Appellate Counsel outside the Office of the Wyoming Public Defenders Appellate Division"OrderDenyFinal
06/04/2007Correspondence - Incoming - Received letter from appellant inquiring about the status of his pending motions. Sent another copy of the 5/23/07 order denying motions.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/15/2007Motion - Other - "Motion Requesting Leave of the Court for the Appellant's Amicus Curiae Brief to be Considered in Conjunction with Appellate Counsel's Opening Brief that was Filed on May 18 of 2007" - treated as motion to file pro se brief. Proposed brief received.MotionOtherFinal
06/29/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
07/10/2007Order - Denying appellant's request for leave to file pro se supplemental brief.OrderDenyFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/17/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/24/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/25/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/04/2007Correspondence - Incoming - letter from Mr. Brown requesting status of motion filed 5/11/07. Sent copy of order.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
01/30/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/15/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/15/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/22/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/20/08 by E. Smith.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal