Case: 02-07-00298-CV
02-07-00298-CV
08/27/2007
Divorce
Brian E. Hendershot
Heather L. Hendershot
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/29/2008 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
05/12/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee | |
01/28/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/11/2008 | Mandate issued | | |||||||
10/02/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
06/04/2008 | Submitted | | |||||||
05/29/2008 | Reply brief filed | | |||||||
05/12/2008 | Set for submission on oral argument | | |||||||
05/12/2008 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
05/12/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||||
05/07/2008 | Letter received | | |||||||
04/07/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
04/07/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
02/25/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
02/25/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
01/28/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||||
12/07/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
12/07/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
11/13/2007 | Reporters record filed | | |||||||
10/02/2007 | Request for Extension of Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
10/02/2007 | Received Reporter's Record Affidavit or Letter | | |||||||
09/25/2007 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||||
09/14/2007 | Notice from Lead Counsel | | |||||||
09/10/2007 | Notice from Lead Counsel | | |||||||
08/27/2007 | Other Document Received | | |||||||
08/27/2007 | Other Document Received | | |||||||
08/27/2007 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||||||
08/27/2007 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/11/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Hendershot, Heather L. | Appellee | Thomas M. Michel |
Hendershot, Brian E. | Appellant | Kenneth L. McAlister |
Trial Court Information
324th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Jerome S. Hennigan
324-375693-04