judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERTS VS. EICON

Case Information: 34727
Short Caption:ROBERTS VS. EICONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A394493Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from James L. Roberts--NSB Money Order No. 527794783.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07985
09/17/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-RR/WM/MS 99-08810
10/13/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-09933
10/13/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/08/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 27, 1999. 99-09933